Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Delmar Burkholder In The Matter Of The Application Of, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Infant Settlement) case represented by Condren, John Robert, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Infant Settlement) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
|
This complaint is an application by Delmar Burkholder, the father and natural guardian of an infant named D.B., to settle a claim related to an accident. On October 28, 2022, D.B. was struck by a vehicle operated by Shawn M. Lanphear while riding a b...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2023ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE
Date: December 06, 2023RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE
Date: September 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E FLH Medical, P.C. Reports Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Ambulance Run Sheet Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Report of Dr. Kevin A. Walter, M.D., 11.21.2022 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C URMC Discharge Summary - 10.31.2022 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 14, 2023PETITION
Date: September 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 | ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE | ||
November 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Court Transcript |
||
November 30, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed ORder Approving Settlement |
||
September 14, 2023 | RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE | ||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E FLH Medical, P.C. Reports Redacted per 22 NYCRR FLH Medical, P.C. Reports Redacted |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Ambulance Run Sheet Redacted per 22 NYCRR Ambulance Run Sheet Redacted |
||
September 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT with Attached Certification of Word Count |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Report of Dr. Kevin A. Walter, M.D., 11.21.2022 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Report of Dr. Kevin A. Walter, M.D., 11.21.2022 Redacted |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C URMC Discharge Summary - 10.31.2022 Redacted per 22 NYCRR URMC Discharge Summary - 10.31.2022 Redacted |
||
September 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR Police Accident Report Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.