Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Ann Mulvaney, represented by Vanzyverden, William, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: December 07, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 07, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 19, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: September 13, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 04, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
December 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 11, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 07, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer |
||
December 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Procedural History |
||
December 07, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
December 07, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.