Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, A Subsidiary Of First National Of Nebraska, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Kolkmann, Karl Edward, Stein, Mark H, against Lee A Worth, represented by Parlakian, Nishan Payel, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 05, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 28, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 15, 2024JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: January 15, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 23, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2023ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 20, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 15, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
January 15, 2024 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
December 06, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
||
December 04, 2023 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
November 28, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
November 23, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Served by mail to Plaintiff Attorney 11/21/2023 |
||
November 23, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Served by Mail 11/21/2023 to Plaintiff Attorney Def aff in Opposition |
||
October 25, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Summary Judgment |
||
October 20, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.