Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
United States Of America Acting Through The Rural Housing Service Or Successor Agency, United States Department Of Agriculture, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Tarab, Margaret Burke, Weissinger, George Joseph, against Esl Federal Credit Union, John Doe And Jane Doe #1 Through #7, The Last Seven Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Keuka Housing Council, Inc., Midland Funding Llc, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 8) See All represented by Mcintyre, Kelly Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: November 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)
Date: September 07, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER - SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: August 22, 2023REPORT OF GUARDIAN
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: November 01, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 19, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 19, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) AMENDED PLEADINGS
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 19, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 04, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: May 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Observer & Finger Lake Times |
||
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Pleadings |
||
November 01, 2023 | REPORT OF GUARDIAN | ||
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Observer |
||
September 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION & FINANCE |
||
September 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
||
September 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) | ||
September 07, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
September 07, 2023 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) | ||
August 22, 2023 |
ORDER - SERVICE BY PUBLICATION and Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.