Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Christa Socha, Sean Socha, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Zoghlin, Jacob Henry, Zoghlin, Mindy Lee, against Abc Corporations 1-10, John Does 1-10, Town Of Starkey, Town Of Starkey Zoning Board Of Appeals, Town Of Starkey Zoning Enforcement Officer, (total of 5) See All represented by Chalifoux, Sheila Mary, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason L. Cook presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: April 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 12, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: April 12, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 22, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: May 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 09, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: May 22, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: May 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: May 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service serving Notice of Appeal |
||
December 11, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #1) Petitioners Notice of Appeal dated December 11, 2023 |
||
November 14, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Decision and Order dated November 9, 2023 |
||
November 09, 2023 | JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY | ||
August 22, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to C. Raymond Brewer III from Jacob Zoghlin with cc to Hon. Barry L. Porsch and all parties v Letter to C. Raymond Brewer III from Jacob Zoghlin with cc to Hon. Barry L. Porsch and all parties v ... show more |
||
August 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF HARD COPY EXHIBIT FILING | ||
August 18, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
June 02, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 02, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
June 02, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT (Motion #1) Petitioners' June 2, 2023 letter to the Court in opposition to Respondents' request to file a Sur Re Petitioners' June 2, 2023 letter to the Court in opposition to Respondents' request to file a Sur Re ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.