Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Terry Stuart, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION
Date: April 13, 2022EXECUTION
Date: May 25, 2023SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 13, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 19, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Satisfaction of Judgment | ||
May 25, 2023 | EXECUTION | ||
April 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 13, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#362773 |
||
January 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 19, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 19, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.