Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Andrea Robinson, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 12, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 18, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 22, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: April 18, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A CLIENT STATEMENTS
Date: April 18, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2023EXECUTION
Date: July 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
July 18, 2023 |
EXECUTION Returned Income Execution - Fully Satisfied |
||
April 18, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
April 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
April 18, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
April 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
April 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
April 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
April 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS CLIENT STATEMENTS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
April 18, 2022 | JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.