Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Shawn Hoose, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lowry, Maria Elena, against Tammy Green, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 21, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 05, 2021SUMMONS
Date: October 05, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Amended Attorney Affirmation - 12/21/21 |
||
December 21, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 21, 2021 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
December 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 07, 2021 | Affirmation in Support of Default Judgment | ||
December 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 05, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
October 05, 2021 | SUMMONS | ||
October 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Copy of Lease Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.