Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schuyler Hospital Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammond, Chad Richard, against Megan Pipe, Theodore Pipe Jr., in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2021BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 15, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 09, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 |
EXECUTION Returned Income Execution - Partially Satisfied |
||
December 09, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
December 09, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AND ENTRY THEREOF |
||
December 08, 2021 |
BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted |
||
December 08, 2021 |
JUDGMENT with Bill of Costs |
||
December 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 15, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION Redacted |
||
October 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
October 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 04, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT VERIFIED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.