Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert Davis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schwartz, Carl Jacob, against Tammy Davis, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
March 04, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
January 27, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
January 19, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 10, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
January 05, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
January 05, 2022 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
January 05, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
January 05, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
January 05, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.