Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
In The Matter Of Drb Capital, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Transfer Of Structure) case represented by Jensen, Donald W, against B. Buckle, Brighthouse Life Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Transfer Of Structure) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
|
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 16, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 12, 2021PETITION
Date: September 16, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 16, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 16, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Signed Order Application for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
||
October 11, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order |
||
October 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
September 20, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 16, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Attorney Affirmation |
||
September 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Absolute Sale and Security Agreement |
||
September 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B New York Disclosure Statement |
||
September 16, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Order To Show Cause |
||
September 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Payee's Declaration |
||
September 16, 2021 | Petition To Transfer Structure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.