Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Kerri S, Rooney, Timothy F, Sheerin, John J, against Steve Lieberman, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: December 13, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 09, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 09, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
December 13, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 09, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
November 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 02, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.