Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Ricky Becker, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 01, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 01, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 01, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: April 01, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: April 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 04, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
April 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
April 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
April 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
April 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
April 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.