Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kenneth Disbrow, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Balling, Amanda Harris, Bates, Alison Christine, against Christa M. Kizis-Disbrow, represented by Scibetta, Michael Paul, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Shannon J Pero presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShannon J Pero Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 18, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE | ||
January 12, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE | ||
January 11, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 06, 2023 | MOTION PAPERS | ||
January 06, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
January 04, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
January 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 03, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
December 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.