Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Philip D Pielow A K A Philip Pielow, Philip D Pielow A K A Philip Pielow, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 20, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 15, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 15, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
October 15, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT |
||
October 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) DEFAULT LTR ON INTERRAGATORIES |
||
October 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) ANSWER |
||
October 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
October 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
October 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.