Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
K. Y., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Benno, Ameer N., Forbes, Randall Vanessa, Kolodny, Michelle Rivlin, Macinnis, Nicholas Gerome, Scalice, Adam P., (total of 6) See All against Gorham-Middlesex Central School District D B A Marcus Whitman Central School, represented by Mathews, Jennifer E., Symons, Charles E, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Charles A. Schiano presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles A. Schiano Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a revival action brought under the New York Child Victims Act. The plaintiff, identified as K.Y., alleges that they were sexually abused and assaulted as a public school student. The defendant in this case is the Gorham-Middlesex Ce...
ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: March 17, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 05, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: March 20, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: March 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 12, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 06, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 14, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 14, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 14, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2021SUMMONS
Date: July 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | ORDER - MEDIATION | ||
March 20, 2023 |
ORDER - AMENDED Amended Case Scheduling Order |
||
March 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
March 16, 2023 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Amended Scheduling Order |
||
January 05, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
December 30, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Scheduling Order |
||
October 28, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 13, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) | ||
October 12, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
October 06, 2021 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.