Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 1983 |
CategoryFamily Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings re:
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation for the Appointment of | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.