Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Reliant Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Amanda L. Hamm, represented by Asani, Zarije, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 23, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 01, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 01, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 03, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
||
January 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
December 30, 2021 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
December 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1) affirmation of attorneys' fees |
||
December 08, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed order |
||
October 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
October 01, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion |
||
October 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) loan application and terms |
||
October 01, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affidavit in support of motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.