Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 19, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 16, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 29, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 29, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
November 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 29, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Military Affidavit |
||
October 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Client Statements |
||
October 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Signed NON SOL |
||
October 29, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
October 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Signed PJTAFF |
||
July 19, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.