Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 18, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: August 25, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: August 18, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Returned Income Execution - Partially Satisfied |
||
August 25, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 25, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
August 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
August 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
August 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT |
||
August 18, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AOF |
||
August 18, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
August 18, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
July 19, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.