Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Karaszewski, Darleen Veronica, Whitbeck, Scott Joseph, against Cathy Morse, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Cycle Time20 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 15, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: March 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Affidavit of Fact by Debt Buyer Plaintiff Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 17, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Non-Military Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 17, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service and Invoice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) Original Creditor Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
March 21, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 15, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 15, 2023 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Judgment |
||
March 15, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) | ||
February 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Redaction Cover Page |
||
February 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mail Service |
||
February 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavit of Fact by Debt Buyer Plaintiff Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Fact by Debt Buyer Plaintiff Redacted |
||
February 17, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.