Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
James Emmons, Jane Emmons, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Halpin, Robert L., against Murray R Wheeler, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Barry L Porsch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Sch
Date: March 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 24, 2023REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: March 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 26, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: June 22, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 10, 2022OATH Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: December 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 21, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO CLERK
Date: February 01, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: March 24, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 17, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: February 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (PROPOSED) - VACANT/ABANDONED PROPERTY
Date: September 12, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: August 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: September 23, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: September 23, 2022OATH Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: November 07, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: December 22, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: November 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Sch Referee's Report Schedule A |
||
March 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Referee's Report Exhibit B |
||
March 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Referee's Report Exhibit A |
||
March 24, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
November 28, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
November 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
November 07, 2022 |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #3) Corrected Plaintiff's Bill of Costs |
||
September 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of Regularity Exhibit B |
||
September 23, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE (Motion #2) Filing on Behalf of - Carol B Winslow, Chief Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.