Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nbt Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Autumn Spears, Brenda Raplee, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason L. Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason L. Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2020ORDER OF SEVERANCE CPLR 3215(A) (PROPOSED)
Date: April 12, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: September 01, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 25, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 30, 2021 | ORDER - AWARDING FEE | ||
August 25, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 25, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) military search D2 |
||
August 25, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) non military D2 |
||
August 25, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) 3215 D2 |
||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.