We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Raymond Dell V. Town Of Jerusalem, Keuka Park Water &Amp; Sewer District

Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago

Raymond Dell, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Donlon, Michael Anthony, against Keuka Park Water & Sewer District, Town Of Jerusalem, represented by Long, James Austin, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.

Case Details for Raymond Dell v. Keuka Park Water & Sewer District , et al.

Filing Date

March 28, 2017

Category

Torts - Other (Property Damage)

Last Refreshed

November 21, 2023

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Yates County, NY

Matter Type

General Torts

Parties for Raymond Dell v. Keuka Park Water & Sewer District , et al.

Plaintiffs

Raymond Dell

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Donlon, Michael Anthony

Defendants

Keuka Park Water & Sewer District

Town Of Jerusalem

Attorneys for Defendants

Long, James Austin

Case Documents for Raymond Dell v. Keuka Park Water & Sewer District , et al.

Case Events for Raymond Dell v. Keuka Park Water & Sewer District , et al.

Type Description
JUDGMENT
Notice of Entry for signed Judgment dated June 24, 2022
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO CLERK
Letter to the Clerk regarding the recently filed Judgment
EXHIBIT(S) - A
Costs of Plaintiff
Notice of Entry for Decision signed on June 17, 2022 and entered June 22, 2022
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
ORDER - OTHER
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Proposed Order
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #16)
Supplemented Exhibit A - Sworn Affidavit of Mark P. Zaporowski
See all events