Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Teresa A Stetzel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Chambers, Victor B., against Bradley A Stetzel, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason L. Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason L. Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 09, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 12, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
November 01, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 01, 2021 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
November 01, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
January 31, 2018 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
September 08, 2015 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER | ||
September 08, 2015 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
September 08, 2015 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.