Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Cook, Hon. Jason L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2018 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted
Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
February 04, 2020 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 02/26/2020Withdrawn Before Justice: Cook, Hon. Jason L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
February 04, 2020 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #003) Decided: 03/10/2020Granted Before Justice: Cook, Hon. Jason L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
February 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
November 12, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
October 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
August 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
August 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.