Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Cook, Hon. Jason L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, Hon. Jason L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2019 |
CategoryComm-Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
March 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001)
Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
February 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
December 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
December 09, 2019 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/09/2020Withdrawn Before Justice: Cook, Hon. Jason L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
January 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.