Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Selip, Mitchell Howard, Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Laura Burkhardt, represented by Fowlkes, William Y., in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts with Melissa Cianfrini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Wyoming. The plaintiff, Synchrony Bank, is suing the defendant, Laura Burkhardt, for breach of a CareCredit-branded revolving credit account. The plaintiff alleges that ...
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 21, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 21, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: December 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter To The Court To Withdrawal Motion For Summary Judgment |
||
January 18, 2024 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Dunning Letter |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit Of Service |
||
December 21, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Credit Card Agreement |
||
December 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.