Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Corey Holloman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fine, Aaron David, Meirowitz, Samuel Miles, Wurgaft, Matthew Adam, against Custom Vehicle Outfitters, Llc, Jeffrey Oliver Demare, represented by Koch, Aimee La Fever, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Wyoming. The plaintiff, Corey Holloman, is suing Custom Vehicle Outfitters, LLC, and Jeffrey Oliver Demare. The basis of venue is the site of the accident. The complain...
ANSWER
Date: November 28, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 22, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 22, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Lien Information |
||
December 22, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Demands |
||
December 22, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Supplemental Relief |
||
December 22, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
December 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
November 28, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
October 17, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.