Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Johnson, Heather Ann, against Joshua P Borycki, represented by Goodwin, Brian R., in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a consumer credit transaction case filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A., against Joshua P Borycki. The complaint alleges that Joshua P Borycki failed to make payments on a consumer credit card account issued by...
NOTICE
Date: October 06, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 28, 2023NOTICE
Date: September 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 |
NOTICE Additional Notice of Lawsuit |
||
September 29, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
September 27, 2023 |
NOTICE Additional Notice of Lawsuit |
||
September 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 28, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Joshua P Borycki |
||
August 28, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Credit Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.