Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wesley Clark & Peshkin, Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Katy Day A K A Kaytlin Day, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of Wyoming County, New York. The plaintiff, Wesley Clark & Peshkin, LLP, is a law firm, and the defendant is Katy Day, also known as Kaytlin Day. The complaint alleges that the defendant r...
NOTICE
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation SOL |
||
November 09, 2023 | Affidavit of Non-Military Service | ||
November 09, 2023 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
November 09, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 27, 2023 |
NOTICE Additional Notice of Lawsuit |
||
September 21, 2023 | Affidavit of Compliance | ||
September 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
August 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Account |
||
August 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Arbitration Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.