Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Susan Bressette Aka Susan K Bressette, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts with Melissa Cianfrini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 05, 2024ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: January 31, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 05, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 05, 2024NOTICE
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
January 25, 2024 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
January 05, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
January 05, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.