Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Conifer Realty, Llc, Wny Preservation Lp, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Brown, Marc William, against The Assessor For The Town Of Arcade, The Board Of Assessment Review For The Town Of Arcade, The Town Of Arcade, New York, represented by Kurtzhalts, Joel R, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts with Michael M Mohun presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael M Mohun Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 13, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 13, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 23, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 13, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 16, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Settlement |
||
September 13, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 12, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 12, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Certified Statement of Income and Expense |
||
August 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 23, 2021 | PETITION | ||
July 23, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.