Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County. This case was filed in Wyoming County Superior Courts with Michael F. Griffith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2019 |
CategoryMat-Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
July 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
June 07, 2021 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
May 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
March 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
March 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
February 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Held Mohon (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
May 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Mohon (Motion Part) Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
|
May 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Mohon (Motion Part) Judge: Mohun, Hon. Michael M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.