Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Cazarez, Francisco J., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions169 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time169 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931240-OSC Hearing (Enforcement); County of Napa vs. Cazarez, Francisco J. Motion OSC Details: 911170 - Contempt/Failure to Comply ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause-Enforcement (DCSS) 914223-Order: Show Cause (Enforcement) Motion/OSC Detail: 911170 - Contempt/Failure to Comply Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER: SHOW CAUSE (ENFORCEMENT) [914223] Motion: CONTEMPT/FAILURE TO COMPLY [911170] Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 14 2007 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 926130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [926130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 913310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service DECLARATION [913310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.