Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jazelle S. Bruce, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Carter, Suzanne M, against Charles Osae Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Sam D Walker presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
|
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER | |
April 24, 2018 | Hearing |
Judgment Granted Uncontested Matrimonial Part Judge: Walker, Hon. Sam D. |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER (PROPOSED) | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | UCS - 111 | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.