Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Highland Terrace Housing Development Fund Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kourland, Nancy L., against Martha Deberry, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Joan B Lefkowitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoan B Lefkowitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Highland Terrace Housing Development Fund Corporation against Martha Deberry. The plaintiff, Highland Terrace Housing Development Fund Corporation, is a residential cooperative Housing Development Fund Corp...
COURT NOTICE
Date: January 09, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (AMENDED)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 17, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 16, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 22, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (AMENDED) | ||
November 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 20, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
November 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) 202.7 Notice |
||
November 17, 2023 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
November 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Photographs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.