Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lpp Mortgage Ltd, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roth, Gerald C, against Sheila C Mason A K A Sheila Mason, Tyrone O Raysor Sr, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Francesca E Connolly presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions379 days |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time379 days |
ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: July 21, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2013JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: January 14, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2013EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: November 25, 2014EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 17, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Redacted |
|
March 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM Redacted |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A supporting documents |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - REFERENCE ORDER OF REFERENCE entered in the Office of the County Clerk on July 21, 2014 |
|
June 20, 2014 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Foreclosure Settlement Conference Part Judge: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | |
May 15, 2014 | Hearing |
Default - Unrepresented Foreclosure Settlement Conference Part Judge: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FCN MAILED TO SHEILA C. MASON AND TYRONE RAYSOR RETURNED TO SENDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.