Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Level 5 Construction, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Levi, Jill, Ponzo, Brandon, against Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, E.C.C.O Iii Enterprises, Inc., Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Skanska Ecco Iii 2 Jv, (total of 8) See All represented by Cortegiano, Mark L, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Linda S Jamieson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda S Jamieson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Level 5 Construction, Inc. against multiple defendants in the Supreme Court of the State of New York. The complaint alleges that the defendants, including Skanska Ecco III2JV and various insurance companies...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: December 22, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT PC Date: 2/14 at 12pm |
||
January 26, 2024 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) In addition to the PC order, please be sure to fill out ALL 3 ADR forms attached at the end of this In addition to the PC order, please be sure to fill out ALL 3 ADR forms attached at the end of this ... show more |
||
January 12, 2024 |
STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Motion #1) Stipulation to Adjourn motion to Dismss and Briefing Schedule |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #1) Requisition 28 |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #1) Requisition 26 |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) Requisition 22 |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Change Order 1 |
||
December 22, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
December 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
December 22, 2023 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.