Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
State Of New York Mortgage Agency, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against And John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Rhea Elizabeth Zificsak As Executor Of The Estate Of Maureen Susan Zificsak A K A Maureen Zificsa A K A Maureen S. Zificsa, State Of New York, William Zificsak, (total of 5) See All represented by Risalvato, Anthony Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Joan B Lefkowitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoan B Lefkowitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure action filed by the State of New York Mortgage Agency against Rhea Elizabeth Zificsak, as Executor of the Estate of Maureen Susan Zificsak, William Zificsak, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., State of New York, and "...
And John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 25, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 16, 2024CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 26, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: October 26, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 25, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 25, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2023COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 25, 2024 | Affidavit of Service by Mail | ||
January 25, 2024 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 16, 2024 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY to perfect service |
||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RHEA ELIZABETH ZIFICSAK |
||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM ZIFICSAK |
||
December 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES | ||
December 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA |
||
November 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.