Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Phillips, Elliot, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Shameek M Reid, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Terry Jane Ruderman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions251 days |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time395 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) OSC/NO APPEARANCES REQUIRED, ON PAPERS ONLY Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
October 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001)
Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
October 28, 2020 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Before Justice: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane Answer demanded: No Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 12, 2018 | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION non military affirmation |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION address affirmation |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.