Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ryne Feulner, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Flynn, Mary E., against Kenneth Mccallion, Individually And And D B A Mccallion & Associates, Susan Hynes, Individually And D B A Libertas Support Services, Inc, represented by Attorney Opted Out Of Efiling, Mccallion, Kenneth F, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Citarella, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management191 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time441 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 04, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: December 08, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 16, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 20, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 29, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 21, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 25, 2014ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 21, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 25, 2014ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 17, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 21, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 20, 2015ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: July 13, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled Settlement Conference Part Judge: Settlement Conference Part, |
|
December 21, 2015 | Hearing |
Remand Settlement Conference Part Judge: Settlement Conference Part, |
|
November 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #002) Compliance Part Motions Judge: Compliance Part, |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice |
|
November 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Compliance Part Motions Judge: Compliance Part, |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Stipulation to Adjourn Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Service |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Plaintiff's memorandum of law in support of motion for partial summary judgment and default judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.