Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maryon Noble, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Loveless, John J A M, against Greenburgh Town, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Bruce E Tolbert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF PETITION/PETITION (TAX CERTIORARI)
Date: December 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Settled
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued Motola, Renee M. Tax Certioari Part |
|
June 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled Motola, Renee M. Tax Certioari Part |
|
April 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled Motola, Renee M. Tax Certioari Part |
|
March 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued Motola, Renee M. Tax Certioari Part |
|
January 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued Motola, Renee M. Tax Certioari Part |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION/PETITION (TAX CERTIORARI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.