Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Attorney For Child, Amy Leah Shapiro-Kessler, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Werfel- Martineau, Ellen, against Justin A. Kessler, represented by Fellin, John Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with John P Colangelo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 27, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 24, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
June 14, 2022 | UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL PACKET - WITH CHILDREN | ||
June 14, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
June 14, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
June 14, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
June 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
June 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.