Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Woodlawn Electrical Supply, Inc, filed a(n) Unfair Competition - Antitrust case represented by Becker, Joseph Michael, Zerilli, Robert F, against Smith-El-Dis-Co., Inc. D B A Smith Electrical Supply, represented by Anderson, James Ross, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Nancy Quinn Koba presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Unfair Competition) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaAntitrust |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeUnfair Competition |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 23, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 30, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 07, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 28, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 23, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 23, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 10, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 31, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 06, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 07, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 14, 2022ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: December 22, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 23, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 03, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 01, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Responses to Document Demands |
||
February 01, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Post Note Conference Order |
||
January 23, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
January 23, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 11, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note of Issue, Certificate of Readiness for Trial and Trial Readiness Order |
||
December 22, 2022 | ORDER - TRIAL READINESS | ||
November 14, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
August 10, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
August 01, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Proposed Compliance Conference Stipulation & Order Parties to sign and email to the Court before 8.8 Proposed Compliance Conference Stipulation & Order Parties to sign and email to the Court before 8.8 ... show more |
||
July 23, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.