Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Leslie Rosenberg As The Executrix Of The Estate Of Josephine Nardi, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kelly, Dennis, Kerrigan, Robert M., against Providence Rest, Inc,, Westchester Medical Center Health Network A K A Westchester Medical Center, represented by Corgan, John J, Dempsey, Terence Edward, Weis, Claudine L, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Lewis Jay Lubell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. The plaintiff, Leslie Rosenberg, as the Executrix of the Estate of Josephine Nardi, is suing Westchester Medical Center Health Network (als...
COURT NOTICE
Date: December 15, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS Westchester Medical Center Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 29, 2023NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: December 14, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars- Providence Rest Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 14, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 14, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 14, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 14, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 26, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 26, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 22, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 12, 2024 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
January 09, 2024 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) MEDICAL, DENTAL AND PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE ACTIONS |
||
December 29, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Westchester Medical Center Redacted per 22 NYCRR Westchester Medical Center Redacted |
||
December 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Response to combined demands (Westchester Medical Center) |
||
December 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Verified Bill of Particulars (Westchester Medical Center) |
||
December 29, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's combined responses to defendant's demands Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's combined responses to defendant's demands Redacted |
||
December 15, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 14, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection- Providence Rest Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice for Discovery and Inspection- Providence Rest Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.