Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc D B A Champion Mortgage Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Golab, Mark, Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against Capital One Bank Usa, N.A., Jane Gussoff, Michael Gussoff As Executor Of The Estate Of Beverly Gussoff, Michael Gussoff As Executor Of The Estate Of Beverly Gussoff, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 7) See All represented by Zebrowski, Kathleen A, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Mary H Smith presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions410 days |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time410 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2016ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: June 08, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 09, 2016ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 16, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: October 14, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 20, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 17, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 25, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 01, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
July 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #003) Mary H. Smith - Mtn Judge: Smith, Hon. Mary H. |
|
July 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Mary H. Smith - Mtn Judge: Smith, Hon. Mary H. |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
June 20, 2017 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #003) Decided: 08/16/2017Granted Before Justice: Smith, Hon. Mary H. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Smith, Hon. Mary H. |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Notice of Pendency |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.