Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Sheerin, John J, Valle, Jonathan Irving, against Maureen A Murphy, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 30, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: March 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 30, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 03, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 03, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: December 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 18, 2022 | ||
February 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
February 03, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 16, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 30, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Maureen A Murphy |
||
September 30, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.