Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Joann M Mclaughlin, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Della Jacono, John F., Savit, Joel B, Taub, Michael L, against Chappaqua Central School District, represented by Brennan, John T, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with William J Giacomo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam J Giacomo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time647 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 26, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 01, 2016ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: July 20, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: January 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 28, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 20, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2015ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: July 20, 2016ANSWER
Date: September 30, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: January 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: November 04, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001)
Date: November 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
February 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) William J. Giacomo-Mtn Judge: Giacomo, Hon. William J. |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) Authorization - E-Filing User (HMD) |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Judge Giacomo with Working Copies of Plaintiff's Opposition to SJ Motion #001 with NYSCEF |
|
January 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Compliance Part Motions Judge: Compliance Part, |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Meteorologist Expert Steven Roberts, CCM |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) McLaughlin Affidavit |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B to Roberts Affidavit -- Certified Weather Records |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.