Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aig Property Casualty Company A S O Mitchell Kaufman And Christina Kaufman, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lambert, Lawrence Brett, against Breville Usa Inc., represented by Green, Joseph Harvey, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Janet C Malone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet C Malone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Property Damage/Negligenc) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 07, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 05, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 04, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 07, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 01, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 01, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 07, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 26, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 30, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 29, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 29, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
August 01, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Fully Executed Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
February 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Claim File |
||
February 16, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Supplemental Response |
||
February 08, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 04, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 26, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 30, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - PC PART |
||
December 29, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 29, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.